Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Personal Automobile Insurance - Rescission of Policy or Binder - Misrepresentations by Applicant
Sponsored by
Senator Mathias
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing an insurer to rescind a policy or binder of personal automobile insurance if an applicant makes specified misrepresentations; requiring the insurer to provide specified notice to an applicant that insurance coverage may be rescinded under specified circumstances; requiring an insurer to take specified actions before rescinding insurance coverage; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/13/2013
Legislative Date
2/14/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2013
Legislative Date
2/27/2013
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/13/2013 2/14/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/27/2013 2/27/2013 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-106 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM