Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Sponsored by
Senators Eckardt and Ferguson
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing all counties and municipal corporations to release liens for unpaid real property taxes or other charges and assessments to facilitate a transfer of real property if certain conditions are satisfied; authorizing a county or municipal corporation to withhold certain real property from tax sale under certain circumstances; authorizing the governing body of a county or municipal corporation to sell certain abandoned property at tax sale for less than the total amount of certain taxes, interest and penalties, and expenses; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1112
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2018
Legislative Date
3/15/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {969837/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/20/2018
Action
Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {625062/1 Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/24/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Floor Amendment {553720/1 (Delegate Ali) Adopted
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2018
Legislative Date
3/25/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (137-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/04/2018
Legislative Date
3/30/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Enrolled - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/08/2018
Legislative Date
5/08/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/15/2018 3/15/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {969837/1 Adopted 48
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/20/2018 3/20/2018 Hearing 3/27 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/02/2018 4/02/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Favorable with Amendments {625062/1 Adopted 58
House 4/02/2018 3/24/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Floor Amendment {553720/1 (Delegate Ali) Adopted 59
House 4/03/2018 3/25/2018 Third Reading Passed (137-0) 59
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 61
Senate 4/04/2018 3/30/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
Post Passage 5/08/2018 5/08/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 568
Text - Chapter - Tax Sales - Vacant and Abandoned Property
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-806, 14-811, 14-817, 14-824, 14-833 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM