Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Pharmacy Benefits Managers - Pharmacy Contracts - Maximum Allowable Cost Pricing
Sponsored by
Senator Astle
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a pharmacy benefits manager to include, in each contract with a contracted pharmacy, the sources used to determine maximum allowable cost pricing; requiring the pharmacy benefits manager to update its pricing information with a specified frequency and provide a means by which contracted pharmacies may review pricing updates in a specified format; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0793
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): January 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2014
Legislative Date
2/06/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2014
Legislative Date
2/28/2014
Action
Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {707073/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2014
Legislative Date
3/16/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/24/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
51
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
56
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
4/03/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (136-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
61
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/05/2014
Legislative Date
5/05/2014
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2014 2/06/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/28/2014 2/28/2014 Hearing 3/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/20/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Favorable with Amendments {707073/1 Report Adopted 50
Senate 3/21/2014 3/16/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 50
Senate 3/24/2014 3/17/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 51
House 3/25/2014 3/20/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 56
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
House 3/28/2014 3/28/2014 Hearing 4/01 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/02/2014 4/03/2014 Favorable Report by Health and Government Operations
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 63
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 Second Reading Passed 63
House 4/04/2014 3/28/2014 Third Reading Passed (136-0) 64
Senate 4/05/2014 3/27/2014 Returned Passed 61
Post Passage 5/05/2014 5/05/2014 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 363
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   15-1628.1 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM