Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Public and Nonpublic High Schools - Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, beginning in the 2020-2021 school year, county boards of education to provide instruction on organ and tissue donation and registration as part of a certain curriculum in grades 9 through 12 in public schools; specifying the purposes and goals of the instruction; encouraging nonpublic high schools to provide instruction on organ and tissue donation and registration in a certain manner; and encouraging county boards to provide instruction on organ and tissue donation and registration during the 2019-2020 school year.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0567
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2019
Legislative Date
2/15/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2019 2/15/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Education - Public and Nonpublic High Schools - Organ and Tissue Donation Awareness Instruction
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-446 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM