Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Federal-Aid Primary Highways - Signs
Sponsored by
Senator Hershey
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the State Highway Administration to issue a permit for a sign along or near a federal-aid primary highway if the sign is a directional sign for a historic, cultural, or educational site that is naturally suited for outdoor recreation.
Committees
Original:
Finance
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0961
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Reassigned to Finance
Proceedings
22
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/12/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2016
Legislative Date
3/04/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2016
Legislative Date
3/07/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Reassigned to Finance 22
Senate 2/12/2016 2/12/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2016 3/04/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/07/2016 3/07/2016 Unfavorable Report by Finance; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM