Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credits - Poultry Houses - LED Lighting and Solar Panel Systems
Sponsored by
Senator Eckardt
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for expenses related to the installation of certain lighting systems on certain poultry houses; requiring the Maryland Energy Administration to administer the tax credit; requiring the Administration to issue tax credit certificates not exceeding $5,000; requiring the Administration to approve applications for tax credits on a first-come, first-served basis and in a timely manner; applying the Act to taxable years beginning after December 31, 2017, but before January 1, 2023; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/08/2018
Legislative Date
3/08/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2018
Legislative Date
3/09/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax Credits - Poultry Houses - LED Lighting and Solar Panel Systems
Senate 3/08/2018 3/08/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/09/2018 3/09/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-746 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM