Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Family Law - Domestic Violence - Definition of Abuse
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "abuse" for purposes of specified provisions of law relating to domestic violence to include harassment and malicious destruction of property; and defining harassment and malicious destruction of property.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1396
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-501 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM