Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City Residential Retention Act
Sponsored by
Senator Ferguson
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Mayor and City Council of Baltimore City to grant, by law, a property tax credit against the property tax imposed on a dwelling in Baltimore City that is newly purchased by a homeowner who has received the homestead property tax credit for a dwelling in Baltimore City under specified circumstances; providing that the credit is a fixed amount of $4,000 to be applied to the homeowner's property tax bill over a period of 5 years, but may be increased by an additional $1,000 under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0920
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2014
Legislative Date
4/05/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {309031/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/28/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
3/29/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
68
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 4/05/2014 4/05/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Favorable with Amendments {309031/1 Report Adopted 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/28/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 62
Senate 4/07/2014 3/29/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63
House 4/07/2014 4/01/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 68
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM