Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Motor Vehicles - Speed Monitoring Systems - Automated Audits
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Requiring that a speed monitoring system be subject to an automated, real-time audit; prohibiting an audit from being conducted by an employee or representative of the speed monitoring system contractor; and requiring that the results of the audit remain in the custody and be the property of the local jurisdiction that authorized the speed monitoring system and be admitted as evidence in any court proceeding for a violation that is the subject of the audit.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1052
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2016
Legislative Date
2/05/2016
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/17/2016
Legislative Date
2/17/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/18/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2016
Legislative Date
2/26/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/08/2016 2/05/2016 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/10/2016 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/17/2016 2/17/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/18/2016 2/18/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 2/25/2016 2/26/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   21-809 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM