Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland
Sponsored by
Senator Hettleman
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing the requirement that a certain representative designated by a unit of the University System of Maryland to coordinate certain sexual harassment prevention training be the unit's Title IX Coordinator.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Opposite:
Appropriations
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0325
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2020
Legislative Date
2/07/2020
Action
Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2020
Legislative Date
2/24/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {827274/1 Adopted
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2020
Legislative Date
2/25/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
35
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/27/2020
Legislative Date
2/27/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
37
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
2/28/2020
Legislative Date
2/28/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
38
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Finance
Text - First - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland
Senate 2/07/2020 2/07/2020 Hearing 2/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Senate 2/24/2020 2/24/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Favorable with Amendments {827274/1 Adopted 35
Senate 2/25/2020 2/25/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 35
Text - Third - Sexual Harassment Prevention Training - Designated Coordinator - University System of Maryland
Senate 2/27/2020 2/27/2020 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 37
House 2/28/2020 2/28/2020 Referred Appropriations 38
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/28/2020 11:09 AM