Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Workers' Compensation Commission - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring a custodian of records to deny inspection of the part of a public record of the Workers' Compensation Commission that contains personal information of an individual other than by an attorney of a party to a workers' compensation claim; requiring a custodian to allow inspection of a certain part of a certain public record by the person in interest or a party to the claim for workers' compensation that the record concerns; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Information Act - Workers' Compensation Commission - Denial of Part of a Public Record
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs and Finance
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m. (Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM