Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Secretary of State and Attorney General - Charitable Enforcement and Protection of Charitable Assets
Sponsored by
Senator Kelley
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the Attorney General to take specified actions relating to investigations of alleged violations of laws relating to charitable organizations and charitable representatives; repealing specified authority for the legal counsel for the Office of the Secretary of State to administer oaths and examine an individual under oath; providing a specified enforcement action or other remedy is subject to specified immunity or limitation on liability; establishing the Charitable Enforcement Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1352
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014, October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
4/01/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {918873/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/02/2014
Legislative Date
3/24/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
58
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/25/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
59
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2014
Legislative Date
3/27/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
63
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/31/2014 4/01/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Favorable with Amendments {918873/1 Report Adopted 58
Senate 4/02/2014 3/24/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 58
Senate 4/03/2014 3/25/2014 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 59
House 4/03/2014 3/27/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 63
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6.5-101 through 6.5-105, 6-205, 6-206, 6-2A-01, 6-302, 6-402, 6-407, 6-5A-02, 6-621, 6-622 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM