Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Eckardt
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Natural Resources, in consultation with interested stakeholders, to review specified conflicts that arise related to aquaculture and submerged aquatic vegetation, develop solutions to these conflicts, and report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; requiring the Department, notwithstanding specified provisions of law, to adopt regulations that establish standards and a process for evaluating specified aquaculture leases; etc.
Details
Emergency Bill
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): Upon Enactment
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724233/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/03/2017
Legislative Date
3/27/2017
Action
Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
3/28/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (139-0)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/05/2017
Legislative Date
3/30/2017
Action
Returned Passed
Proceedings
59
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/04/2017
Legislative Date
5/04/2017
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Chapter - Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {724233/1 Adopted 43
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43
Text - Third - Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Environment and Transportation 46
House 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Hearing 3/29 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 4/03/2017 Favorable Report by Environment and Transportation
House 4/03/2017 3/27/2017 Favorable Adopted Second Reading Passed 61A
House 4/04/2017 3/28/2017 Third Reading Passed (139-0) 62
Senate 4/05/2017 3/30/2017 Returned Passed 59
Post Passage 5/04/2017 5/04/2017 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 380
Text - Chapter - Aquaculture - Leases - Submerged Aquatic Vegetation
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM