Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Funding
Sponsored by
Senator Rosapepe
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Increasing, from $500,000 to $1,500,000, the amount of certain court costs collected by the District Court that the Comptroller is required to pay into the Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Funding
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/04/2019
Legislative Date
3/04/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Criminal Injuries Compensation Fund - Funding
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Senate 3/04/2019 3/04/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM