Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore City - Imitation Firearms - Prohibition
Sponsored by
Senators Washington, Carter, Hayes, and McCray
Status
In the Senate - Withdrawn by Sponsor
Analysis
Synopsis
Prohibiting the sale and display of certain imitation firearms in Baltimore City; and providing that a certain violation is a civil offense subject to a fine of $500 for the first offense and $1,500 for each subsequent offense.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1160
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Baltimore City - Imitation Firearms - Prohibition
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2020
Legislative Date
3/02/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Withdrawn by Sponsor
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Baltimore City - Imitation Firearms - Prohibition
Senate 3/02/2020 3/02/2020 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Withdrawn by Sponsor
(   4-111 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page