Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Department of Veterans Affairs - Opioid Time Lock Dispenser Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Middleton, Kittleman, and Miller
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Secretary of Veterans Affairs to establish a specified opioid time lock dispenser pilot program; requiring the Secretary to adopt specified regulations to carry out the pilot program; prohibiting the Secretary from requiring that a veteran pay a fee in order to get a time lock dispenser; requiring the Secretary annually to submit a report to the Governor and the General Assembly on the progress of the pilot program; and terminating the Act after September 30, 2018.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1343
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/18 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM