Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
Sponsored by
Senator Feldman
Status
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 840
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing a person to which a specified certificate of public convenience and necessity is issued for the construction of a specified overhead transmission line to acquire specified property or rights by condemnation; and applying the Act to the construction of an overhead transmission line for which a certificate of public convenience and necessity is required.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1308
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2017
Legislative Date
2/07/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {787675/1 Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/12/2017
Action
Referred Economic Matters
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters
Proceedings
Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
4/07/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {273996/1 Adopted
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/07/2017
Legislative Date
3/31/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
65 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (104-31)
Proceedings
68 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
63AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/10/2017
Legislative Date
4/03/2017
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/27/2017
Legislative Date
5/27/2017
Action
Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 840
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2017 2/07/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
Vote - Senate - Committee - Finance Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {787675/1 Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 44 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2017 3/12/2017 Referred Economic Matters 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Vote - House - Committee - Economic Matters Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 4/07/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Economic Matters
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Favorable with Amendments {273996/1 Adopted 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/07/2017 3/31/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 65 Click to view Recorded Media
House 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (104-31) 68 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Senate Concurs House Amendments 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 63AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 4/10/2017 4/03/2017 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
Post Passage 5/27/2017 5/27/2017 Enacted under Article II, Section 17(c) of the Maryland Constitution - Chapter 840
Text - Chapter - Electricity - Construction of Overhead Transmission Lines - Condemnation Authority
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page