Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Local Preference Procurement Program
Sponsored by
Senator Jones-Rodwell
Status
In the Senate - First Reading Senate Rules
Analysis
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study the Establishment of a Local Preference Procurement Program; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study, evaluate, and make recommendations regarding specified matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and specified committees of the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2014; terminating the Act after June 30, 2015; etc.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1223
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM