Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Drugged Driving - Oral Fluid Tests - Pilot Program
Sponsored by
Senators Kagan, Bates, Cassilly, Currie, Feldman, Ferguson, Guzzone, Lee, Madaleno, Manno, Mathias, McFadden, Muse, Peters, Ramirez, Raskin, Serafini, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a pilot program to authorize a police officer of the Baltimore County Police Department, the Montgomery County Department of Police, the Prince George's County Police Department, and the Ocean City Police Department who has reasonable grounds to believe that an individual is or has been driving or attempting to drive a motor vehicle while impaired by a controlled dangerous substance to request the individual to submit an oral fluid sample subject to specified standards; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1367
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2016
Legislative Date
3/11/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/11/2016 3/11/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   11-147.1, 16-205.2, 16-205.3, 16-813 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM