Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Petition for Writ of Actual Innocence - Appeal Right
Sponsored by
Senator Cassilly
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a person aggrieved by an order on a petition for writ of actual innocence, including the Attorney General and a State's Attorney, may appeal to the Court of Special Appeals; requiring the appeal to be in a form set by the Maryland Rules; and providing that the court may stay the order and set bail under specified circumstances.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1202
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2016
Legislative Date
2/10/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/15/2016
Action
Hearing cancelled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2016
Legislative Date
3/16/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/09/2016 2/10/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/15/2016 3/15/2016 Hearing cancelled
Senate 3/15/2016 3/16/2016 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM