Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting Discrimination
Sponsored by
Senator Kagan
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering the requirements for a specified nondiscrimination clause that prohibits specified discrimination by a contractor against an employee or applicant for employment; requiring the Maryland Commission on civil rights, in conjunction with the Department of Commerce, to study strategies for increasing the diversity on boards of directors of for-profit and nonprofit entities in Maryland and report the findings and recommendations to the General Assembly on or before December 1, 2017; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0919
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724232/1
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2017
Legislative Date
3/14/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted
Proceedings
43 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {724232/1
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/15/2017
Legislative Date
3/15/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
44 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2017
Legislative Date
3/16/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted
Proceedings
45 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (27-18)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {213324/1 (Senator Kagan)
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
46 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {793223/1 (Senator Kagan) Rejected (21-22)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {213324/1 (Senator Kagan) (#2, 5) Adopted (26-19)
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {213324/1 (Senator Kagan) (#1, 3, 4) Adopted
Proceedings
46AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-18)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting Discrimination
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Favorable with Amendments {724232/1 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/14/2017 3/14/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Kagan) Adopted 43 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Favorable with Amendments {724232/1 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Committee Amendment Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/15/2017 3/15/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/16 (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 44 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Special Order until Later Today (Senator Miller) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Favorable with Amendments 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/16/2017 3/16/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/17 (Senator Rosapepe) Adopted 45 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (27-18) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {213324/1 (Senator Kagan) 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 46 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {793223/1 (Senator Kagan) Rejected (21-22) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {213324/1 (Senator Kagan) (#2, 5) Adopted (26-19) 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {213324/1 (Senator Kagan) (#1, 3, 4) Adopted 46AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Procurement - Nondiscrimination Clauses and State Policy Prohibiting Discrimination
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Third Reading Passed (29-18) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/22/2017 3/19/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 53 Click to view Recorded Media
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM
Click to return on the top page