Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore
Sponsored by
Senator Pipkin
Status
In the House - First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Evaluate Mental Health Care Delivery on the Eastern Shore; requiring the Task Force to evaluate matters including whether and to what extent patients with mental illness are being referred to out-of-state mental health facilities, the feasibility of reopening the Upper Shore Community Mental Health Center, and barriers to accessibility; requiring the Task Force to report findings and recommendations to the Governor and committees of the General Assembly on or before December 31, 2013; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/14/2013
Legislative Date
2/15/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2013
Legislative Date
3/25/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Favorable with Amendments {517875/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2013
Legislative Date
3/21/2013
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2013
Legislative Date
3/22/2013
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
55A
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/14/2013 2/15/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Finance
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/22/2013 3/25/2013 Favorable with Amendments Report by Finance
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Favorable with Amendments {517875/1 Report Adopted 52
Senate 3/25/2013 3/21/2013 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 52
Senate 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 53
House 3/26/2013 3/22/2013 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 55A
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM