Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force on Educational Outcomes of Pregnant and Parenting Students in High School and GED Programs
Sponsored by
Senators Ellis, Benson, Carter, Feldman, Guzzone, Hayes, Klausmeier, Lee, McCray, Ready, Waldstreicher, Washington, Young, and Zucker
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force on Educational Outcomes of Pregnant and Parenting Students in High School and GED Programs; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to track and assess, identify, determine, and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the State Board of Education and the General Assembly on or before June 30, 2021; terminating the Act after June 30, 2021; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1201
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2019
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Task Force on Educational Outcomes of Pregnant and Parenting Students in High School and GED Programs
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM