Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Confinement and Release
Sponsored by
Senator Frosh
Status
In the Senate - Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Altering findings and policies regarding the creation of the Division of Pretrial Detention and Services; requiring the Secretary of Public Safety and Correctional Services, on or before May 1, 2015, with the advice of the Pretrial Services Commission to establish a Pretrial Release Services Program in the Department to offer in each county an alternative to pretrial detention; establishing requirements for the program; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1232
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2014, May 1, 2015
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 Adopted
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/07/2014
Action
Re-Referred Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
21
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {248075/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/19/2014
Action
Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments {248075/1
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/27/2014
Legislative Date
3/20/2014
Action
Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Getty) Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (18-28)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {943721/2 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {753223/1 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Miller) {193723/2 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {543820/2 Adopted
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {513020/2 Rejected (9-37)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {493321/2 Rejected (14-31)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2014
Legislative Date
3/21/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
55
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/22/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (37-9)
Proceedings
56
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Motion Rules Suspended Rule 32 Adopted 21
Senate 2/07/2014 2/07/2014 Re-Referred Judicial Proceedings 21
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 Hearing 2/19 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/25/2014 3/26/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Favorable with Amendments {248075/1 53
Senate 3/26/2014 3/19/2014 Laid Over (Senator Kittleman) Adopted 53
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments {248075/1 54
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Committee Amendment Adopted 54
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Favorable with Amendments 54
Senate 3/27/2014 3/20/2014 Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Getty) Adopted 54
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Motion Special Order until 3/31 (Senator Zirkin) Rejected (18-28) 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Favorable with Amendments Report Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Pugh) {943721/2 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {753223/1 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Miller) {193723/2 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Shank) {543820/2 Adopted 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Zirkin) {513020/2 Rejected (9-37) 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Floor Amendment (Senator Kittleman) {493321/2 Rejected (14-31) 55
Senate 3/28/2014 3/21/2014 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 55
Senate 3/31/2014 3/22/2014 Third Reading Passed (37-9) 56
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-102, 5-303, 5-3A-01, 5-3A-02, 5-3B-01 through 5-3B-10 )
(   10-922, 1-206, 2-607, 9-203 )
(   16-204, 2-106, 2-106.1, 4-201, 5-202, 5-205, 5-215, 9-114, 9-115, 9-117 )
(   9-304 )
(   26-202, 26-401, 26-402, 26-403 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM