Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Election Law - Departmental Secretaries - Solicitation of Contributions or Donations
Sponsored by
Senators Madaleno and Conway
Status
In the House - Third Reading Passed with Amendments (85-52)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Prohibiting a secretary of a principal department of the Executive Branch of State government from soliciting, transmitting, or depositing in a campaign account contributions or donations for the benefit of a candidate from a person subject to the regulatory authority of the secretary's governmental unit; requiring a campaign finance entity or other entity that receives a contribution or donation as a result of a violation of the Act to refund the contribution or donation to the contributor or donor; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544932/1
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2016
Legislative Date
3/19/2016
Action
Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {544932/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {393827/1
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2016
Legislative Date
3/20/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Raskin) Adopted
Proceedings
49
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393827/1
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/23/2016
Legislative Date
3/21/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
50
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {393827/1
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/25/2016
Legislative Date
3/23/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Conway) Adopted
Proceedings
52
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {393827/1
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/28/2016
Legislative Date
3/24/2016
Action
Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted
Proceedings
53
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {393827/1 Withdrawn
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2016
Legislative Date
3/25/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed (31-14)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2016
Legislative Date
3/26/2016
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
58
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2016
Legislative Date
4/04/2016
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/09/2016
Legislative Date
4/09/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Favorable with Amendments {945864/1 Report Adopted
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/05/2016
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
68
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Floor Amendment (Delegate Turner) {143929/1 Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/06/2016
Action
Special Order until next session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted
Proceedings
69
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/11/2016
Legislative Date
4/07/2016
Action
Third Reading Passed with Amendments (86-52)
Proceedings
70
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/21/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Favorable with Amendments {544932/1 48A
Senate 3/21/2016 3/19/2016 Laid Over (Senator Cassilly) Adopted 48A
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Favorable with Amendments {544932/1 Report Adopted 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {393827/1 49
Senate 3/22/2016 3/20/2016 Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Raskin) Adopted 49
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Favorable with Amendments {393827/1 50
Senate 3/23/2016 3/21/2016 Special Order until 3/25 (Senator Conway) Adopted 50
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {393827/1 52
Senate 3/25/2016 3/23/2016 Special Order until 3/28 (Senator Conway) Adopted 52
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Favorable with Amendments {393827/1 53
Senate 3/28/2016 3/24/2016 Special Order until 3/29 (Senator Jennings) Adopted 53
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Floor Amendment (Senator Jennings) {393827/1 Withdrawn 54
Senate 3/29/2016 3/25/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Senate 3/30/2016 3/26/2016 Third Reading Passed (31-14) 55
House 3/31/2016 3/26/2016 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 58
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 4/04/2016 4/04/2016 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
House 4/09/2016 4/09/2016 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Favorable with Amendments {945864/1 Report Adopted 68
House 4/11/2016 4/05/2016 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 68
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Floor Amendment (Delegate Turner) {143929/1 Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/06/2016 Special Order until next session (Delegate McIntosh) Adopted 69
House 4/11/2016 4/07/2016 Third Reading Passed with Amendments (86-52) 70
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   13-244 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM