Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Facebook Twitter Youtube Channels MY MGA

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Sponsored by
Chair, Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness
Status
In the House - First Reading Appropriations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Health Services Cost Review Commission, the Department of Public Safety and Correctional Services, the Department of Labor, and the Department of Human Services to make certain reports to the Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness on or before November 15, 2020, and November 15, 2021.
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1031
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
21 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2020
Legislative Date
2/05/2020
Action
Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/13/2020
Action
Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Favorable Adopted
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2020
Legislative Date
3/08/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47AClick to view Recorded Media
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
48 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/15/2020
Legislative Date
3/12/2020
Action
Referred Appropriations
Proceedings
49 Click to view Recorded Media
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Reassigned to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs 21 Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 2/05/2020 2/05/2020 Hearing 3/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs Click to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/13/2020 Favorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Favorable Adopted 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Senate 3/13/2020 3/08/2020 Second Reading Passed 47AClick to view Recorded Media
Text - Third - Joint Committee on Ending Homelessness - Reports on Housing Status
Senate 3/14/2020 3/09/2020 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 48 Click to view Recorded Media
House 3/15/2020 3/12/2020 Referred Appropriations 49 Click to view Recorded Media
Statutes
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:29 PM
Click to return on the top page