Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Regulated Firearms - Transport Through State
Sponsored by
Senators Jacobs, Astle, Brinkley, Colburn, DeGrange, Dyson, Edwards, Getty, Glassman, Hershey, Jennings, Klausmeier, Middleton, Reilly, Simonaire, and Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Specifying that a person who is not a resident of the State and who is not prohibited from possessing a regulated firearm in the person's state of residence may transport a regulated firearm through the State to another state under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0659
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/26/2014
Action
Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/26/2014 2/26/2014 Hearing 3/11 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM