Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History
Sponsored by
Senator McCray
Status
In the Senate - Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting certain departments or local licensing authorities that issue occupational licenses or certificates from denying an application for a license or certificate based on the applicant's criminal history if a period of 5 years has passed since the applicant's conviction for a nonviolent crime unless the department or local licensing authority makes a certain determination; requiring a licensing authority to include in applications a list of specific convictions that would disqualify an applicant; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/08/2019
Legislative Date
4/08/2019
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Occupational Licenses or Certificates - Application Determinations - Use of Criminal History
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/14 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 4/08/2019 4/08/2019 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM