Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Drug Addiction as a Chronic Disease
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Task Force to Study Drug Addiction as a Chronic Disease; providing for the composition, chair, and staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Task Force to study and make recommendations regarding certain matters; requiring the Task Force to report its findings and recommendations to the Governor and the General Assembly on or before April 1, 2020; terminating the Act on September 30, 2020; etc.
Committees
Original:
Finance  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Finance
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Task Force to Study Drug Addiction as a Chronic Disease
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/22/2018
Legislative Date
2/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Finance
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Task Force to Study Drug Addiction as a Chronic Disease
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/22/2018 2/22/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM