Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Health Services Funding - Modifications
Sponsored by
Senators Klausmeier and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Modifying the calculation of local health services funding for fiscal year 2020 and each subsequent fiscal year.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1620
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
Bill imposes a mandated appropriation in the annual State Budget Bill
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Local Health Services Funding - Modifications
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2018
Legislative Date
3/12/2018
Action
Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - Local Health Services Funding - Modifications
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/12/2018 3/12/2018 Hearing 3/14 at 2:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   2-301, 2-302, 2-303 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM