Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Domestic Violence - Active Electronic Monitoring (Amber's Law)
Sponsored by
Senators Ready, King, Lee, and Madaleno
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Analysis
Synopsis
Authorizing the court, as a condition of a defendant's pretrial release on a charge of violating a protective order or if the court suspends the sentence of a defendant convicted of failing to comply with relief granted in an interim protective order, a temporary protective order, or a final protective order, to order that the defendant be supervised by active electronic monitoring; requiring a defendant to pay fees for active electronic monitoring; and authorizing the court to exempt the defendant from the fees.
Committees
Original:
Rules
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0004
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2016
Legislative Date
2/11/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2016
Legislative Date
3/10/2016
Action
Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2016 2/11/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 3/09/2016 3/10/2016 Unfavorable Report by Senate Rules; Withdrawn
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-202, 6-221 )
(   4-509 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM