Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Maryland Benefit Corporations - Purposes, Duties of Directors, and Liability
Sponsored by
Senators Raskin and Feldman
Status
In the Senate - Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Synopsis
Altering the purpose of a Maryland benefit corporation; clarifying that a director of a benefit corporation is required to perform the director's duties in accordance with a specified standard; authorizing a director to consider the effects of a specified action or decision; providing that a director may not be required to give priority to a specified interest or factor over any other interest or factor; etc.
Committees
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2014
Legislative Date
2/27/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/26/2014 2/27/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-6C-01, 5-6C-06, 5-6C-07, 5-6C-09 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM