Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Child Custody - Legal Decision Making and Parenting Time
Sponsored by
Senator Lee
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Repealing references to the terms "child custody" and "visitation" and substituting the terms "legal decision making" and "parenting time" in specified instances; authorizing the court to consider how best to promote stability and long-term health and welfare for children; requiring the court, in determining the appropriate allocation of legal decision making or parenting time between the parties, to consider the ability of the parties to meet the child's developmental needs and create family parenting time schedules; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1232
Introduced in a prior session as: SB0550 Session: 2015 Regular Session
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2016
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/24/2016
Legislative Date
2/24/2016
Action
Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/24/2016 2/24/2016 Hearing 3/15 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-203, 9-101, 9-101.1, 9-101.2, 9-102, 9-103, 9-104, 9-105, 9-106, 9-107, 9-108, 9-201 through 9-204 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM