Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Formal Complaints Against Public Employees
Sponsored by
Senators Carter, Hayes, Lee, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing that records related to a formal complaint of job-related misconduct made against a public employee do not constitute personnel records under the Public Information Act; and authorizing a custodian to deny inspection of records of an investigation, a hearing, or a decision by a governmental unit connected with a complaint of job-related misconduct made against a public employee.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0413
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/26/2019
Legislative Date
2/26/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/11/2019
Legislative Date
3/11/2019
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/14/2019
Legislative Date
3/14/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Information Act - Personnel and Investigatory Records - Formal Complaints Against Public Employees
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/26/2019 2/26/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/11/2019 3/11/2019 Hearing canceled
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/14/2019 3/14/2019 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   4-311, 4-351 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM