Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.
Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Income Tax Credit - Value-Added Processing Expenses
Sponsored by
Senators Hester, Gallion, and Ready
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Allowing a credit against the State income tax for certain qualified capital expenses for use in value-added processing conducted in the State; requiring the Department of Commerce to administer the tax credit; prohibiting a certain business entity from claiming, for the same qualified capital expenses, the credit under the Act and a certain credit against the State income tax for certain expenditures at certain wineries and certain vineyards; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Committee Testimony
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Value-Added Processing Expenses
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2020
Legislative Date
2/10/2020
Action
Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 2:00 p.m.
Text - First - Income Tax Credit - Value-Added Processing Expenses
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/10/2020 2/10/2020 Hearing 3/04 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-735, 10-735.1 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:29 PM