Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund
Sponsored by
Senator Edwards
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing the Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund as a special, nonlapsing fund; specifying the purpose of the Fund; requiring the Department of the Environment to administer the Fund; requiring the State Treasurer to hold the Fund and the Comptroller to account for the Fund; specifying the contents of the Fund; specifying the purpose for which the Fund may be used; requiring that a specified owner of a natural gas or oil interest make a specified demonstration in order to receive compensation from the Fund; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1461
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2017
Contingency - on a contingency described in Sec. 3 of the bill
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/13/2017
Legislative Date
3/13/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Environment - Natural Gas and Oil Interest Restitution Fund
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/13/2017 3/13/2017 Unfavorable Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   14-107.1, 14-107.2 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM