Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Baltimore County - Property Tax Credit - Homes Near a Refuse Disposal System
Sponsored by
Senator Jennings
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Authorizing the governing body of Baltimore County to grant a credit against the county property tax for owner-occupied residential real property within a specified proximity to a specified refuse disposal system; and applying the Act to all taxable years beginning after June 30, 2014.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1247
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Favorable Report Adopted
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/18/2014
Legislative Date
3/13/2014
Action
Second Reading Passed
Proceedings
47
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2014
Legislative Date
3/14/2014
Action
Third Reading Passed (46-0)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2014
Legislative Date
3/17/2014
Action
First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
53
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/26/2014
Legislative Date
3/26/2014
Action
Rereferred to Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/31/2014
Legislative Date
3/31/2014
Action
Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/07/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/17/2014 3/17/2014 Favorable Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Favorable Report Adopted 47
Senate 3/18/2014 3/13/2014 Second Reading Passed 47
Senate 3/19/2014 3/14/2014 Third Reading Passed (46-0) 48
House 3/20/2014 3/17/2014 First Reading House Rules and Executive Nominations 53
House 3/26/2014 3/26/2014 Rereferred to Ways and Means
House 3/31/2014 3/31/2014 Hearing 4/02 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM