Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints
Sponsored by
Senators Muse, Benson, Madaleno, and Robinson
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Department of Juvenile Services to adopt regulations applicable to specified facilities that specify policies for the use of mechanical restraints on children; authorizing the transport of a child to or from a detention facility or hardware secure facility in mechanical restraints, except under specified circumstances and subject to specified conditions; prohibiting a child from being transported to or from a staff secure program in mechanical restraints, except under specified circumstances; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1255
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2017
Legislative Date
3/09/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Juveniles - Mechanical Restraints
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2017 3/09/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   9-227, 9-237, 9-247 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM