Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the House - Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Requiring a judicial officer to make a specified determination regarding release or detention of a defendant before trial; requiring a judicial officer to consider specified information; prohibiting a judicial officer from imposing specified financial conditions of release on a defendant for a specified reason; establishing the Pretrial Services Workgroup to examine the financial impacts of pretrial release conditions, conduct public hearings, and study what pretrial release services were provided to defendants; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1215
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 2, 2017
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {868574/1
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Committee Amendment Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/17/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted
Proceedings
46
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Adopted (26-20)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {553029/2 (Senator Muse)
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/20/2017
Legislative Date
3/17/2017
Action
Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted
Proceedings
46A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {553029/2 (Senator Muse)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Benson) Rejected (13-33)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {553029/2 (Senator Muse) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {413226/1 (Senator Ferguson) Rejected (21-26)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {983925/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {323322/1 (Senator Manno) Rejected (14-29)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {293429/1 (Senator Ferguson) Rejected (17-30)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {923724/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Floor Amendment {263922/1 (Senator Conway) Rejected (19-27)
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2017
Legislative Date
3/19/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/22/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (29-18)
Proceedings
49
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/23/2017
Legislative Date
3/20/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
54
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Judiciary
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/04/2017
Action
Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/01 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments {868574/1 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Committee Amendment Adopted 46
Senate 3/17/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/20 (Senator Pinsky) Adopted 46
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Favorable with Amendments Adopted (26-20) 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Floor Amendment {553029/2 (Senator Muse) 46A
Senate 3/20/2017 3/17/2017 Motion Laid Over (Senator Ferguson) Adopted 46A
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {553029/2 (Senator Muse) 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Motion Special Order until 3/23 (Senator Benson) Rejected (13-33) 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {553029/2 (Senator Muse) Adopted 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {413226/1 (Senator Ferguson) Rejected (21-26) 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {983925/1 (Senator Feldman) Adopted 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {323322/1 (Senator Manno) Rejected (14-29) 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {293429/1 (Senator Ferguson) Rejected (17-30) 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {923724/1 (Senator Zirkin) Adopted 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Floor Amendment {263922/1 (Senator Conway) Rejected (19-27) 48
Senate 3/21/2017 3/19/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48
Text - Third - Criminal Procedure - Pretrial Release
Senate 3/22/2017 3/20/2017 Third Reading Passed (29-18) 49
House 3/23/2017 3/20/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 54
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Judiciary
House 4/04/2017 4/04/2017 Hearing 4/05 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   5-101, 5-201 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM