Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Application to Governor's Cabinet and Governor's Executive Council
Sponsored by
Senators Zucker, Benson, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Guzzone, Lee, Madaleno, McFadden, Middleton, Oaks, Peters, and Smith
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering the definition of "public body" for the purposes of the Open Meetings Act to include the Governor's cabinet and the Governor's Executive Council and any committee of the Council; authorizing the cabinet and the Council and any committee of the Council to meet in closed session for cause subject to a certain provision of law; requiring that each open session of the cabinet and the Council and any committee of the Council be streamed live; etc.
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/09/2018
Legislative Date
2/09/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - General Provisions - Open Meetings Act - Application to Governor's Cabinet and Governor's Executive Council
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/09/2018 2/09/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3-101, 3-206, 3-305, 3-306 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM