Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Local Government Tort Claims Act - Injury From Lead-Based Paint - Application of Notice Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Stone
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Providing that a specified notice requirement under the Local Government Tort Claims Act does not apply to a claim of injury from exposure to lead-based paint occurring on or after January 1, 1988.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1271
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2014
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/10/2014
Legislative Date
2/10/2014
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2014
Legislative Date
2/19/2014
Action
Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/10/2014 2/10/2014 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2014 2/19/2014 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/19/2014 2/19/2014 Hearing 3/12 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM