Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
State Finance and Procurement – Grant to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined
Sponsored by
Senators Kelley, Conway, Currie, Ferguson, Madaleno, McFadden, and Ramirez
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Altering a provision of law to require, rather than authorize, the Board of Public Works to pay a certain grant to a certain individual who has been erroneously convicted, sentenced, and confined; requiring a certain grant made by the Board to include at least $50,000 for each year that the individual was in custody, and a reasonable amount not exceeding $10,000 for payment of the individual's living expenses on release from confinement; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1225
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2018
Legislative Date
2/20/2018
Action
Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Judicial Proceedings and Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 1:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
Text - First - State Finance and Procurement – Grant to Individual Erroneously Convicted, Sentenced, and Confined
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/20/2018 2/20/2018 Hearing 2/28 at 3:00 p.m. (Judicial Proceedings)
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-207 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM