Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Public Safety - Building Codes - Electric Vehicle Charging Infrastructure
Sponsored by
Senator Lam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring, if a certain new building includes the creation of 20 or more parking spaces, 5% of the parking spaces to contain certain electric vehicle charging infrastructure; requiring an electrical room of a new building to be designed to accommodate electrical and distribution equipment needed to serve at least 20% of certain parking spaces; requiring installation of electric vehicle charging infrastructure to meet certain specifications; requiring that a certain raceway be extended to a certain location; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2019
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2019
Legislative Date
2/18/2019
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2019
Legislative Date
2/22/2019
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/25/2019
Legislative Date
2/25/2019
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/21/2019
Legislative Date
3/21/2019
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/18/2019 2/18/2019 First Reading Senate Rules
Text - First - Public Safety - Building Codes - Electric Vehicle Charging Infrastructure
Senate 2/21/2019 2/22/2019 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/25/2019 2/25/2019 Hearing 3/13 at 12:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/21/2019 3/21/2019 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   12-205 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM