Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Sponsored by
Senators Nathan-Pulliam, Ferguson, Guzzone, Kelley, Manno, McFadden, Ramirez, and Smith
Status
In the House - Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Establishing the State Board of Community Health Workers; specifying the purpose and composition of the Board; providing that the role of community health workers does not include providing clinical services; specifying the term of a Board member; requiring the Governor to appoint a new member, within a specified time period, if a vacancy on the Board occurs; authorizing the Governor to remove a member of the Board under specified circumstances; requiring the Secretary of Health and Mental Hygiene to serve as the chair of the Board; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1113
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/29/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Favorable with Amendments {344838/1 Adopted
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/29/2017
Legislative Date
3/25/2017
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
54
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
55
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/30/2017
Legislative Date
3/26/2017
Action
Referred Rules and Executive Nominations
Proceedings
60
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/04/2017
Legislative Date
4/05/2017
Action
Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Text - First - Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 3/09 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2017 3/29/2017 Favorable with Amendments Report by Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Favorable with Amendments {344838/1 Adopted 54
Senate 3/29/2017 3/25/2017 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 54
Text - Third - Health Occupations - Maryland Community Health Worker Act
Senate 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 55
House 3/30/2017 3/26/2017 Referred Rules and Executive Nominations 60
House 4/04/2017 4/05/2017 Rereferred to Health and Government Operations
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   3.5-101 through 3.5-502 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM