Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Task Force to Study Court-Ordered Drug Testing
Sponsored by
Senator Muse
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Establishing a Task Force to Study Court-Ordered Drug Testing; providing for the membership and duties of the Task Force; providing for the staffing of the Task Force; requiring the Governor to appoint the chair of the Task Force; prohibiting a member of the Task Force from receiving specified compensation; authorizing a member of the Task Force to receive reimbursement for specified expenses; requiring the Task Force to report to the General Assembly by a specified date; and providing for the termination of the Act.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Details
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2013
Creates a Task Force or Commission
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2013
Legislative Date
2/18/2013
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/20/2013
Legislative Date
2/20/2013
Action
Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/21/2013
Legislative Date
2/21/2013
Action
Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/15/2013 2/18/2013 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/20/2013 2/20/2013 Rereferred to Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/21/2013 2/21/2013 Hearing 3/20 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:28 PM