Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Washington County Board of Education - Access to Public School Courses - Nonpublic School Students
Sponsored by
Washington County Senators
Status
In the Senate - Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Requiring the Washington County Board of Education to allow a nonpublic school student to enroll in up to three classes in the public school that the nonpublic school student would otherwise be required to attend; requiring a specified nonpublic school student to meet specified eligibility requirements for public school students; requiring the State and county to reimburse a specified public school a specified amount of money under specified circumstances; etc.
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1557
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2016
Bill imposes a local government mandate which is a directive in a bill requiring a local government unit to perform a task or assume a responsibility that has a discernible fiscal impact on the local government unit
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/11/2016
Legislative Date
2/12/2016
Action
First Reading Senate Rules
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/18/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/19/2016
Legislative Date
2/19/2016
Action
Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/11/2016 2/12/2016 First Reading Senate Rules
Senate 2/18/2016 2/19/2016 Rereferred to Education, Health, and Environmental Affairs
Senate 2/19/2016 2/19/2016 Hearing 3/16 at 1:00 p.m.
Documents
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-311 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:30 PM