Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Sponsored by
Senators Edwards, Eckardt, Ferguson, Madaleno, Mathias, McFadden, Peters, and Serafini
Status
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Attorney General's Review Letter
Synopsis
Defining "Tier 1 county" as a county exceeding certain unemployment rates and with less than or equal to 75% of the median State income during certain periods; repealing a certain start-up tax credit under the One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credit Program; expanding the eligibility requirements for a certain project tax credit by altering, under certain circumstances, the number of qualified positions that must be created by a qualified business entity; etc.
Committees
Original:
Budget and Taxation  
Opposite:
Ways and Means  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1295
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): July 1, 2018
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/07/2018
Legislative Date
2/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/15/2018
Legislative Date
2/15/2018
Action
Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:45 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/06/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/07/2018
Legislative Date
3/07/2018
Action
Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {729030/1 Adopted
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/16/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
48A
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/19/2018
Legislative Date
3/17/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
48C
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/20/2018
Legislative Date
3/16/2018
Action
Referred Ways and Means
Proceedings
50
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/22/2018
Legislative Date
3/22/2018
Action
Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
4/05/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
Proceedings
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Favorable with Amendments {625766/1 Adopted
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/27/2018
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
61A
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
4/06/2018
Legislative Date
3/28/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (135-2)
Proceedings
62
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Senate Concurs House Amendments
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Third Reading Passed (45-0)
Proceedings
64
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
4/09/2018
Legislative Date
4/02/2018
Action
Passed Enrolled
Proceedings
Chamber
Post Passage
Calendar Date
5/15/2018
Legislative Date
5/15/2018
Action
Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Senate 2/07/2018 2/07/2018 Hearing 3/13 at 1:00 p.m.
Text - First - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/15/2018 2/15/2018 Hearing 3/07 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:45 p.m.
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/06/2018 3/06/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:15 p.m.
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/07/2018 3/07/2018 Hearing 3/08 at 2:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Budget and Taxation
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Favorable with Amendments {729030/1 Adopted 48A
Senate 3/16/2018 3/16/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 48A
Text - Third - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Senate 3/19/2018 3/17/2018 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 48C
House 3/20/2018 3/16/2018 Referred Ways and Means 50
House 3/22/2018 3/22/2018 Hearing 3/28 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - House - Committee - Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 4/05/2018 Favorable with Amendments Report by Ways and Means
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Favorable with Amendments {625766/1 Adopted 61A
House 4/05/2018 3/27/2018 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 61A
House 4/06/2018 3/28/2018 Third Reading Passed (135-2) 62
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Senate Concurs House Amendments 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Third Reading Passed (45-0) 64
Senate 4/09/2018 4/02/2018 Passed Enrolled
Text - Enrolled - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
Post Passage 5/15/2018 5/15/2018 Approved by the Governor - Chapter 583
Text - Chapter - One Maryland Economic Development Tax Credits - Simplification and Alteration
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   6-401 through 6-403, 6-404, 6-405, 6-406, 6-407 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM