Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Penalty (Educate Against Hate Act)
Sponsored by
Senators Hettleman, Lee, Smith, Waldstreicher, Carter, Sydnor, West, and Young
Status
In the House - First Reading Judiciary
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note (Revised)
Synopsis
Authorizing the court to impose, on a person convicted of a hate crime, a requirement to attend an anti-bias education program.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Opposite:
Judiciary
Committee Testimony
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0485
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2020
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2020
Legislative Date
2/03/2020
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/06/2020
Legislative Date
2/06/2020
Action
Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Penalty (Educate Against Hate Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/09/2020
Legislative Date
3/09/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Favorable with Amendments {478777/1 Adopted
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/10/2020
Legislative Date
3/05/2020
Action
Second Reading Passed with Amendments
Proceedings
44
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Penalty (Educate Against Hate Act)
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/07/2020
Action
Third Reading Passed (47-0)
Proceedings
46
Chamber
House
Calendar Date
3/12/2020
Legislative Date
3/10/2020
Action
Referred Judiciary
Proceedings
47
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2020 2/03/2020 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Senate 2/06/2020 2/06/2020 Hearing 2/11 at 12:00 p.m.
Text - First - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Penalty (Educate Against Hate Act)
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/09/2020 3/09/2020 Favorable with Amendments Report by Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Favorable with Amendments {478777/1 Adopted 44
Senate 3/10/2020 3/05/2020 Second Reading Passed with Amendments 44
Text - Third - Criminal Law - Hate Crimes - Penalty (Educate Against Hate Act)
Senate 3/12/2020 3/07/2020 Third Reading Passed (47-0) 46
House 3/12/2020 3/10/2020 Referred Judiciary 47
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   10-304 through 10-306 )
Last Updated: 9/22/2020 3:29 PM