Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Education - Privately Contracted School Bus Drivers - Annual Physical Examination Requirement
Sponsored by
Senator Nathan-Pulliam
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Analysis
Fiscal and Policy Note
Synopsis
Prohibiting an individual from operating a school bus for a private, nongovernmental entity under a contract with a local school system to transport pupils unless the individual completes an annual medical physical examination and submits a copy of the examination report to the individual's employer attesting that the individual's medical health is satisfactory; establishing a penalty; etc.
Committees
Original:
Judicial Proceedings  
Details
Cross-filed with: HB0943
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): October 1, 2017
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/03/2017
Legislative Date
2/03/2017
Action
First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/08/2017
Legislative Date
2/08/2017
Action
Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Calendar Date
Legislative Date
Action
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/06/2017
Legislative Date
3/06/2017
Action
Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/03/2017 2/03/2017 First Reading Judicial Proceedings
Text - First - Education - Privately Contracted School Bus Drivers - Annual Physical Examination Requirement
Senate 2/08/2017 2/08/2017 Hearing 2/22 at 1:00 p.m.
Vote - Senate - Committee - Judicial Proceedings
Senate 3/06/2017 3/06/2017 Unfavorable Report by Judicial Proceedings
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
(   7-802 )
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:35 PM