Search
Bill number does not exist. Enter a vaild keyword.

Legislation

Original
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Opposite
Chamber
1st
Reading
Referral
to Cmte
2nd
Reading
3rd
Reading
Review in
Original Chamber
Passed Both
Chambers
Conf. Cmte
(if necessary)
To Governor
Title
Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Miracle League Baseball Field
Sponsored by
Senators Norman, Cassilly, and Jennings
Status
In the Senate - Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Analysis
Bond Bill Fact Sheet
Synopsis
Authorizing the creation of a State Debt in the amount of $125,000, the proceeds to be used as a grant to the Board of Directors of the Miracle League of Harford County, Inc. for the acquisition, planning, design, construction, repair, renovation, reconstruction, site improvement, and capital equipping of the Miracle League Baseball Field, located in Harford County; providing for disbursement of the loan proceeds; etc.
Committees
Details
Cross-filed with: HB1706
Bill File Type: Regular
Effective Date(s): June 1, 2018
NOTE: Bond bills that received funding in fiscal 2019 were amended into the State's Capital budget (SB 186). Individual bond bills were not acted upon by the legislature, instead the General Assembly amended SB 186 to specifically list the projects it selected for Bond Funding.
History
Legislation History
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/05/2018
Legislative Date
2/05/2018
Action
First Reading Budget and Taxation
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
2/28/2018
Legislative Date
2/28/2018
Action
Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/02/2018
Legislative Date
3/02/2018
Action
Hearing canceled
Proceedings
Chamber
Senate
Calendar Date
3/05/2018
Legislative Date
3/05/2018
Action
Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
Proceedings
Chamber Calendar Date Legislative Date Action Proceedings
Senate 2/05/2018 2/05/2018 First Reading Budget and Taxation
Text - First - Creation of a State Debt - Harford County - Miracle League Baseball Field
Senate 2/28/2018 2/28/2018 Hearing 3/10 at 1:00 p.m.
Senate 3/02/2018 3/02/2018 Hearing canceled
Senate 3/05/2018 3/05/2018 Unfavorable Report by Budget and Taxation; Withdrawn
File Code
Subjects
Statutes
Last Updated: 2/3/2020 2:36 PM